LA HB138 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to certain substances in the Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to certain substances in the Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 138 FINAL PASSAGE (#784) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 138 FINAL PASSAGE (#265) (Y: 77 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17HouseEffective date: 08/01/2019.
2019-06-17HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 354.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-03HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-06-02SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 5 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-06-02SenateRules suspended.
2019-05-30SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-29SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-28SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-15SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2019-05-14SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-13HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 77, nays 17. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/13/19.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-01HouseReported with amendments (12-0-1).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-03-25HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-03-25HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB138&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1117927
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130064
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133669
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141370
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144275
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129901
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125278
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130600
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140770
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1117938
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130306
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133684
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145427
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133611
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141028

Bill Comments

feedback