LA HB135 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides sanctions for frivolous appeals and writ applications
Title
Provides sanctions for frivolous appeals and writ applications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 135, FINAL PASSAGE (#885) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 135, FINAL PASSAGE (#12) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 135, FINAL PASSAGE (#12) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 184. | |
2010-06-04 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-04 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-03 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-02 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-01 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-20 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-19 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-18 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-06 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | |
2010-04-05 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-03-31 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 5, 2010. | |
2010-03-31 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2010-03-30 | Reported favorably (12-0) (Local and Consent). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2010-03-05 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/5/2010. | |
2010-03-04 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2010-03-04 | Prefiled. |