LA HB134 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the composition and authority of the Allen Parish Capital Improvements Board

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the composition and authority of the Allen Parish Capital Improvements Board

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 134 FINAL PASSAGE (#257) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-05HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2021.
2021-05-03HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-29HouseReported favorably (12-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2021-03-19HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2021.
2021-03-17HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2021-03-17HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback