LA HB134 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopts daylight saving time as the standard time
Title
Adopts daylight saving time as the standard time
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2020-02-24 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020. |
2020-02-21 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2020-02-21 | House | Prefiled. |