LA HB133 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 53-14-2)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Revises the definition of abortion

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises the definition of abortion

Sponsors

Rep. Frank Hoffmann [R]Rep. Mark Abraham [R]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]
Rep. John Anders [D]Rep. James Armes [D]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]
Rep. Taylor Barras [R]Rep. John Berthelot [R]Rep. Robert Billiot [D]Rep. Ryan Bourriaque [R]
Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Terry Brown [I]Rep. Thomas Carmody [R]Rep. Stephen Carter [R]
Rep. Charles Chaney [R]Rep. Patrick Connick [R]Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]
Rep. Raymond Crews [R]Rep. Paula Davis [R]Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]Rep. Mary DuBuisson [R]
Rep. Stephen Dwight [R]Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]Rep. Reid Falconer [R]
Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D]Rep. John Guinn [R]Rep. Lance Harris [R]
Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Dorothy Hill [D]Rep. Valarie Hodges [R]Rep. Paul Hollis [R]
Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. Mike Huval [R]Rep. Barry Ivey [R]Rep. Katrina Jackson [D]
Rep. Mike Johnson [R]Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D]Rep. Nancy Landry [R]Rep. Bernard LeBas [D]
Rep. Tanner Magee [R]Rep. Jack McFarland [R]Rep. Blake Miguez [R]Rep. Gregory Miller [R]
Rep. Pat Moore [D]Rep. John Morris [R]Rep. Stuart Moss [R]Rep. Kevin Pearson [R]
Rep. Rogers Pope [R]Rep. Steve Pylant [R]Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Alan Seabaugh [R]
Rep. Scott Simon [R]Rep. Joseph Stagni [D]Rep. John Stefanski [R]Rep. Julie Stokes [R]
Rep. Christopher Turner [R]Rep. Mark Wright [R]Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]Sen. Regina Barrow [D]
Sen. Dale Erdey [R]Sen. Bob Hensgens [R]Sen. Fred Mills [R]Sen. Francis Thompson [D]
Sen. Michael Walsworth [R]

Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 133 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1004) (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 133 ADOPT (#1000) (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 133 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#644) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 133 FINAL PASSAGE (#436) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 133 FINAL PASSAGE (#164) (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseEffective date: 08/01/2019.
2019-06-20HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 376.
2019-06-10HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-06SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-06HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-05HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2019-06-05SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 5 nays.
2019-06-05SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2019-06-05HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 89, nays 1. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2019-06-04HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/05/19.
2019-06-04SenateConference committee report received.
2019-06-04HouseConference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
2019-06-03HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2019-06-03SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Mills, Barrow, and Walsworth.
2019-05-31SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2019-05-31HouseHouse conferees appointed: Hoffmann, Pope, and Chaney.
2019-05-29SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2019-05-29HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2019-05-23HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/29/19.
2019-05-21HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-05-21SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-20SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-16SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-15SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-07SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-05-06SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-06HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/06/19.
2019-04-29HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably (12-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-25HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-25HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB133&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1117759
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127383
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143358
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144611
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136348
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137549
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139097
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1117770
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127763
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142377
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131468
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136507
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143247
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143302

Bill Comments

feedback