LA HB131 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to covered claims of the Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to covered claims of the Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 131 FINAL PASSAGE (#243) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-27SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-22SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2020-05-21SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-05-21HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/21/20.
2020-05-15HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-13HouseReported favorably (11-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2020-02-24HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020.
2020-02-21HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2020-02-21HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback