LA HB131 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to interviewing crime victims and family members

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to interviewing crime victims and family members

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 131 FINAL PASSAGE (#729) (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 131 AMENDMENT # 2947 BY CARTER HB 131 BY COUSSAN (#728) (Y: 7 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 131 FINAL PASSAGE (#109) (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03SenateReconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2019-06-03SenateRules suspended.
2019-06-01SenateNotice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
2019-06-01SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 12 yeas and 22 nays.
2019-05-23SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-22SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-21SenateReported with amendments.
2019-05-01SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2019-04-30SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-30HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 24. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/30/19.
2019-04-25HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-24HouseReported with amendments (8-7).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-03-25HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-03-25HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB131&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1117760
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127204
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125699
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127093
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136139
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137235
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139924
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139496
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140774
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1117766
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127316
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136159
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129241
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140776

Bill Comments

feedback