LA HB1289 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-04 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-04 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the appointment of a deputy constable
Title
Provides for the appointment of a deputy constable
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-04-29 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 4, 2010. | |
2010-04-26 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-22 | Reported with amendments (10-0-1) (Regular). | |
2010-04-15 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2010-04-14 | Read by title. |