LA HB128 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to possession of a firearm by a felon (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to possession of a firearm by a felon (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 128 FINAL PASSAGE (#993) (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Vote on HB 128 FINAL PASSAGE (#820) (Y: 65 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Vote on HB 128 FINAL PASSAGE (#820) (Y: 65 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2024. |
2024-06-03 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 413. |
2024-05-24 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-21 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-21 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 10 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-05-01 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 65, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2024. |
2024-04-30 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-29 | House | Reported favorably (17-3). |
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2024-04-16 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-23 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2024. |
2024-02-22 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-22 | House | Prefiled. |