LA HB1275 | 2014 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation HB406

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 19, nays 73. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides specified procedures for notice, public hearings, and reports regarding permits from the office of conservation of the Dept. of Natural Resources for operations that involve hydraulic fracture stimulation in certain parishes (EG SEE FISC NOTE SD EX)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides specified procedures for notice, public hearings, and reports regarding permits from the office of conservation of the Dept. of Natural Resources for operations that involve hydraulic fracture stimulation in certain parishes (EG SEE FISC NOTE SD EX)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 1275 FINAL PASSAGE (#857) (Y: 19 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-12HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 19, nays 73. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
2014-05-12HouseCalled from the calendar.
2014-05-05HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2014.
2014-05-05HouseNotice given.
2014-05-05HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2014-04-30HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2014.
2014-04-28HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2014-04-24HouseRead by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 406 reported by the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs (8-0).

Same As/Similar To

HB406 (Replaces) 2014-04-24 - Becomes HB 1275.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback