LA HB127 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Effective date: May 26, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Effective date: May 26, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes transfer of certain property to the Recreation District No. One of Ward Three of Calcasieu Parish (EN +$1,000 SG RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes transfer of certain property to the Recreation District No. One of Ward Three of Calcasieu Parish (EN +$1,000 SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 127, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#845) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 127, FINAL PASSAGE (#534) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 127, FINAL PASSAGE (#56) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 127, FINAL PASSAGE (#534) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 127, FINAL PASSAGE (#56) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Effective date: May 26, 2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 27. | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-05-18 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-05-17 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2010-05-13 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 17, 2010. | |
2010-05-10 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-05-10 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-05 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-04 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-03 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-08 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | |
2010-04-07 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-05 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 7, 2010. | |
2010-04-05 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-03-31 | Reported with amendments (14-0-1) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |
2010-03-05 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/5/2010. | |
2010-03-04 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |
2010-03-04 | Prefiled. |