LA HB126 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates funds for payment of consent judgment against the state in the suit entitled Alma Gonzales Mora, et al v. Sidney Farrior, et al c/w Lee Mar v. The Hanover Insurance Company, et al
Title
Appropriates funds for payment of consent judgment against the state in the suit entitled Alma Gonzales Mora, et al v. Sidney Farrior, et al c/w Lee Mar v. The Hanover Insurance Company, et al
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2021-03-19 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2021. |
2021-03-15 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2021-03-15 | House | Prefiled. |