LA HB125 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Reported with amendments (13-0).
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the enforcement of environmental violations through the expedited enforcement program (OR INCREASE SD RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the enforcement of environmental violations through the expedited enforcement program (OR INCREASE SD RV See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseReported with amendments (13-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2019-03-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019.
2019-03-22HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2019-03-22HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback