LA HB125 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 41, nays 56. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 41, nays 56. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for the statewide election of the state superintendent of education (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for the statewide election of the state superintendent of education (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 125 FINAL PASSAGE (#549) (Y: 42 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 41, nays 56. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/2014. |
2014-04-16 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-04-15 | House | Reported without amendments (11-0). |
2014-04-14 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2014-04-10 | House | Reported with amendments (9-7). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2014-02-07 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/7/2014. |
2014-02-07 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2014-02-07 | House | Prefiled. |