LA HB1247 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 63-26-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Effective date: July 2, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 63-26-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Effective date: July 2, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits coverage of elective abortions by health insurance issuers
Title
Prohibits coverage of elective abortions by health insurance issuers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 1247, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1661) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1247, CO-AUTHORS (#1526) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1247, FINAL PASSAGE (#1525) (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1247, AMENDMENT B-87A, MOTION TO ADOPT (#353) (Y: 19 N: 66 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on HB 1247, AMENDMENT B-89, MOTION TO ADOPT (#354) (Y: 21 N: 65 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on HB 1247, FINAL PASSAGE (#356) (Y: 76 N: 13 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1247, AMENDMENT B-88, MOTION TO ADOPT (#355) (Y: 17 N: 67 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1247, CO-AUTHORS (#1526) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1247, FINAL PASSAGE (#1525) (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1247, AMENDMENT B-87A, MOTION TO ADOPT (#353) (Y: 19 N: 66 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on HB 1247, AMENDMENT B-89, MOTION TO ADOPT (#354) (Y: 21 N: 65 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on HB 1247, FINAL PASSAGE (#356) (Y: 76 N: 13 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1247, AMENDMENT B-88, MOTION TO ADOPT (#355) (Y: 17 N: 67 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-02 | Effective date: July 2, 2010. | |
2010-07-02 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 941. | |
2010-06-18 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-16 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2010-06-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010. | |
2010-06-14 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-14 | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-01 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-27 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-26 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-04-26 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2010-04-22 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 13. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 22, 2010. | |
2010-04-15 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-14 | Reported with amendments (8-1) (Regular). | |
2010-04-05 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2010-03-31 | Read by title. |