LA HB123 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts from the Public Records Law information relative to certain activities associated with stocking and breeding of alligators

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts from the Public Records Law information relative to certain activities associated with stocking and breeding of alligators

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 123 FINAL PASSAGE (#393) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 123 FINAL PASSAGE (#106) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-05-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-21HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-20HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-05-20SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-13SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-09SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-08SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-01SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2019-04-30SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-30HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/30/19.
2019-04-25HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-24HouseReported with amendments (8-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2019-03-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019.
2019-03-22HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2019-03-22HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback