LA HB123 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to service of motions for summary judgment (EG NO IMPACT See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to service of motions for summary judgment (EG NO IMPACT See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-24 - House - House Vote on HB 123 FINAL PASSAGE (#68) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-25SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2014-03-24SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2014-03-24HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2014-03-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 03/24/2014.
2014-03-18HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2014-03-17HouseReported favorably (8-0).
2014-03-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2014-02-07HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/7/2014.
2014-02-06HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2014-02-06HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback