LA HB1218 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-04 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-04 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the clerks of court to remit unused funds or to demand payment for costs in civil matters within a certain period of time
Title
Requires the clerks of court to remit unused funds or to demand payment for costs in civil matters within a certain period of time
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-05-04 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-05-04 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-04-29 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 4, 2010. | |
2010-04-26 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-22 | Reported with amendments (11-0-1) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-19 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2010-03-19 | Prefiled. |