LA HB121 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Effective date: 08/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requires public schools to provide at least one recess period per school day in schools with any grade kindergarten through fifth grade

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires public schools to provide at least one recess period per school day in schools with any grade kindergarten through fifth grade

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 121 FINAL PASSAGE (#688) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 121 FINAL PASSAGE (#538) (Y: 66 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-08HouseEffective date: 08/01/2023.
2023-06-08HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 219.
2023-06-07HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2023-06-06SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2023-06-05HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2023-06-04HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2023-06-04SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2023-06-03SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2023-06-02SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2023-06-01SenateReported favorably.
2023-05-23SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2023-05-22SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2023-05-18HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 28. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2023-05-18HouseCalled from the calendar.
2023-05-18HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2023-05-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2023.
2023-05-11HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2023-05-10HouseReported with amendments (9-0).
2023-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2023-03-17HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/17/2023.
2023-03-16HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2023-03-16HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=23rs&b=HB121&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1303569
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1320873
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1329400
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1332280
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1320847
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1323903
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1323815
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1303579
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1321021
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1333970
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1323949
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1329327

Bill Comments

feedback