LA HB119 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the Advisory Council on Historically Black Colleges and Universities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the Advisory Council on Historically Black Colleges and Universities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 119 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#882) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 119 FINAL PASSAGE (#468) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 119 FINAL PASSAGE (#88) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21HouseEffective date: 08/01/2021.
2021-06-21HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 417.
2021-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-03HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-01HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2021-05-27HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/01/2021.
2021-05-26HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-05-25SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-19SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-18SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-17SenateReported with amendments.
2021-04-28SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-04-27SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-04-27HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2021.
2021-04-26HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-22HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-03-19HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2021.
2021-03-15HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-03-15HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB119&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1203933
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216406
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230329
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235918
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224611
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1203937
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216729
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224698
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229676
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1238629
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218014
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228166
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230204

Bill Comments 750

feedback