LA HB118 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 42-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Restricts spending of the state general fund (direct) from recurring money to 98% of the official forecast (EG -$196,000,000 GF EX See Note)
Title
Restricts spending of the state general fund (direct) from recurring money to 98% of the official forecast (EG -$196,000,000 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 118 FINAL PASSAGE (#140) (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 32. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20. |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported favorably (20-0). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2020-02-24 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020. |
2020-02-20 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2020-02-20 | House | Prefiled. |