LA HB117 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes golf carts to cross certain Louisiana highways within the town of Church Point

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes golf carts to cross certain Louisiana highways within the town of Church Point

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 117 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#755) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 117 FINAL PASSAGE (#481) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 117 FINAL PASSAGE (#58) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseVetoed by the Governor.
2019-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-02HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in.
2019-05-31HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2019-05-28HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/19.
2019-05-28HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-05-27SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-22SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-21SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-20SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-30SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-04-29SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-25HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-25HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-04-25HouseRead by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
2019-04-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/25/19.
2019-04-23HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-22HouseReported favorably (15-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-03-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019.
2019-03-22HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-03-22HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB117&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1117152
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125835
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127882
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140316
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127702
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127472
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134941
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139985
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140234
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1117165
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126043
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127928
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134996
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144565
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127743
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137909

Bill Comments

feedback