LA HB117 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Mystic Krewe of Femme Fatale" specialty license plate
Title
Creates the "Mystic Krewe of Femme Fatale" specialty license plate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 117 CO-AUTHORS (#740) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 117 FINAL PASSAGE (#739) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Vote on HB 117 FINAL PASSAGE (#8) (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 117 FINAL PASSAGE (#739) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Vote on HB 117 FINAL PASSAGE (#8) (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2024. |
2024-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 366. |
2024-05-17 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-15 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-18 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 105, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/18/2024. |
2024-03-13 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-12 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-02-23 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2024. |
2024-02-21 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-02-21 | House | Prefiled. |