LA HB116 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Effective date: 01/01/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Effective date: 01/01/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to loss years for purposes of the net operating loss deduction for corporate income tax (Item #5) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to loss years for purposes of the net operating loss deduction for corporate income tax (Item #5) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Ivey [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 116 FINAL PASSAGE (#115) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House Vote on HB 116 FINAL PASSAGE (#47) (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House Vote on HB 116 FINAL PASSAGE (#47) (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Effective date: 01/01/2017. |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 24. |
2016-03-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-03-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-03-09 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2016-02-26 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 31. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-02-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/26/2016. |
2016-02-25 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-02-24 | House | Reported favorably (18-0). |
2016-02-23 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |