LA HB114 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Withdrawn prior to introduction.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Withdrawn prior to introduction.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to community service litter abatement programs
Title
Provides relative to community service litter abatement programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction. |
2019-03-22 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019. |
2019-03-21 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2019-03-21 | House | Prefiled. |