LA HB1138 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective date: June 25, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective date: June 25, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to workers' compensation and the transfer of indemnity payments by electronic funds transfer
Title
Provides relative to workers' compensation and the transfer of indemnity payments by electronic funds transfer
Sponsors
Rep. Erich Ponti [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 1138, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1662) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1138, FINAL PASSAGE (#1431) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1138, FINAL PASSAGE (#254) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1138, FINAL PASSAGE (#1431) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1138, FINAL PASSAGE (#254) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Effective date: June 25, 2010. | |
2010-06-25 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 619. | |
2010-06-18 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-16 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2010-06-16 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-06-16 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-06-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010. | |
2010-06-14 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-11 | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-09 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-08 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-07 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-04-21 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | |
2010-04-20 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 20, 2010. | |
2010-04-12 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2010-04-08 | Reported favorably (7-0) (Local and Consent). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-19 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | |
2010-03-19 | Prefiled. |