LA HB112 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to blood and saliva testing of persons who expose certain persons to serious infectious diseases (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to blood and saliva testing of persons who expose certain persons to serious infectious diseases (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 112 FINAL PASSAGE (#683) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Vote on HB 112 FINAL PASSAGE (#160) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11HouseEffective date: 08/01/2018.
2018-05-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 118.
2018-05-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-02HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-02HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2018-05-01SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-26SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-25SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-24SenateReported favorably.
2018-04-03SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2018-04-02SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-03-28HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-03-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 03/28/18.
2018-03-22HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-21HouseReported with amendments (15-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2018-02-23HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2018.
2018-02-22HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2018-02-22HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB112&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1066157
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077754
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080446
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092421
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097918
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077614
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079876
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1066173
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075947
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077902
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078045
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080482
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080554
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092533
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1106547
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080336
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092248

Bill Comments

feedback