LA HB110 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to fortified roof endorsements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to fortified roof endorsements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 110 FINAL PASSAGE (#358) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 110 FINAL PASSAGE (#95) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-30HouseEffective date: 08/01/2023.
2023-05-30HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 12.
2023-05-24HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2023-05-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2023-05-22HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2023-05-18HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2023-05-18SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2023-05-08SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2023-05-04SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2023-05-03SenateReported favorably.
2023-04-26SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2023-04-25SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2023-04-25HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2023-04-24HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/25/2023.
2023-04-24HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2023-04-20HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2023-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2023-03-17HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/17/2023.
2023-03-15HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2023-03-15HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=23rs&b=HB110&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1303335
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1314273
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1324093
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1328120
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1311717
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1314202
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1303343
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1314356
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1336026
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1315613
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1323887

Bill Comments

feedback