LA HB11 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the amount of compensation persons required to collect state sales and use tax may deduct for remitting taxes (Item #30) (EN -$2,100,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the amount of compensation persons required to collect state sales and use tax may deduct for remitting taxes (Item #30) (EN -$2,100,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - House - House Vote on HB 11 MOTION TO ADOPT (#188) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 11 ADOPT (#181) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - House - House Vote on HB 11 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#168) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 11 FINAL PASSAGE (#148) (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 11 AMENDMENT # 558 BY JACKSON HB 11 BY STEFANSKI (#147) (Y: 13 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-16 - House - House Vote on HB 11 FINAL PASSAGE (#42) (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-30HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-30SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-30HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 94, nays 4. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2020-06-30HouseRules suspended.
2020-06-30HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-30SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 4 nays.
2020-06-30HouseConference Committee report received.
2020-06-30HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2020-06-30SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Allain, McMath, and Reese.
2020-06-30SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2020-06-30SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2020-06-29HouseHouse conferees appointed: Stefanski, Bishop, and Wright.
2020-06-29HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 1, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2020-06-29HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-06-28SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 9 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-06-28SenateBy a vote of 13 yeas and 25 nays.
2020-06-28SenateSenate floor amendments read and rejected.
2020-06-28SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2020-06-26SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended.
2020-06-25SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-06-24SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-06-23SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2020-06-22SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-06-22SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2020-06-17SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-06-16HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-06-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/16/20.
2020-06-11HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-06-11HouseDischarged from the Committee on Appropriations.
2020-06-11HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2020-06-10HouseReported favorably (13-1).
2020-06-01HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=201ES&b=HB11&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178848
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180781
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185194
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183213
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183126
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183459
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184647
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184648
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184740
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184846
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184985
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178849
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180653
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181304
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182309
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183287
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185107
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185443
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182444
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184650
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185127
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185144

Bill Comments

feedback