LA HB10 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to interest on investment accounts maintained by the board of trustees of the District Attorneys' Retirement System (EG DECREASE APV)
Title
Provides relative to interest on investment accounts maintained by the board of trustees of the District Attorneys' Retirement System (EG DECREASE APV)
Sponsors
Rep. John Illg [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 10 FINAL PASSAGE (#275) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-04 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2024. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-01-19 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/19/2024. |
2024-01-17 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-01-17 | House | Prefiled. |