LA HB1083 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB41
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to hair discrimination in education, employment, public accommodations, and housing options
Title
Provides relative to hair discrimination in education, employment, public accommodations, and housing options
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1083 CO-AUTHORS (#1317) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1083 FINAL PASSAGE (#1316) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 1083 FINAL PASSAGE (#1044) (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1083 FINAL PASSAGE (#1316) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 1083 FINAL PASSAGE (#1044) (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 529. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 24. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2022. |
2022-05-19 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-18 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 41 reported by the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure (8-6-1). |
Same As/Similar To
HB41 (Replaces) 2022-05-18 - Becomes HB 1083.