LA HB1082 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB720
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date: 10/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date: 10/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for election procedures during a state of emergency (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)
Title
Provides for election procedures during a state of emergency (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1082 ADOPT (#1445) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 1082 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1701) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 1082 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1583) (Y: 47 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1082 FINAL PASSAGE (#1153) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 1082 FINAL PASSAGE (#940) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 1082 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1701) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 1082 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1583) (Y: 47 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1082 FINAL PASSAGE (#1153) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 1082 FINAL PASSAGE (#940) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Effective date: 10/01/2022. |
2022-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 528. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2022-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2022-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. |
2022-06-06 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2022-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Hewitt, Price, and Womack. |
2022-06-06 | House | House conferees appointed: Gaines, Stefanski, and Jenkins. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2022-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 47, nays 48, the House refused to concur in the amendments proposed by the Senate. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022. |
2022-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-18 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2022. |
2022-05-16 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-12 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 720 reported by the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs (9-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB720 (Replaces) 2022-05-12 - Becomes HB 1082.