LA HB108 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the compensation of election commissioners and commissioners-in-charge
Title
Provides relative to the compensation of election commissioners and commissioners-in-charge
Sponsors
Rep. Neil Riser [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction. |
2024-02-23 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2024. |
2024-02-20 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-02-20 | House | Prefiled. |