LA HB1072 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB878
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for hearing loss as an occupational disease while employed in the classified police service (EN INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for hearing loss as an occupational disease while employed in the classified police service (EN INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 1072 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1577) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1072 HB 1072 BY HORTON (#1218) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 1072 FINAL PASSAGE (#735) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1072 HB 1072 BY HORTON (#1218) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 1072 FINAL PASSAGE (#735) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 527. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022. |
2022-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2022. |
2022-05-03 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-02 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 878 reported by the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs (14-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB878 (Replaces) 2022-05-02 - Becomes HB 1072.