LA HB1071 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB840
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the funding of the criminalistics laboratory commissions
Title
Provides relative to the funding of the criminalistics laboratory commissions
Sponsors
Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R] | Rep. Michael Echols [R] | Sen. Thomas Pressly [R] | Sen. Alan Seabaugh [R] |
Rep. Christopher Turner [R] | Sen. Barry Milligan [R] | Sen. Barrow Peacock [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1071 FINAL PASSAGE (#831) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 1071 FINAL PASSAGE (#736) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 1071 FINAL PASSAGE (#736) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-05-31 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 235. |
2022-05-26 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-25 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-24 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-10 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-10 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2022. |
2022-05-03 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-02 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 840 reported by the Committee on Judiciary (9-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB840 (Replaces) 2022-05-02 - Becomes HB 1071.