LA HB1070 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB759
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date: 06/16/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date: 06/16/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Governor's Office of Homeland Security and Emergency Preparedness (EN +$1,044,695 SD EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the Governor's Office of Homeland Security and Emergency Preparedness (EN +$1,044,695 SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 1070 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1609) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1070 FINAL PASSAGE (#1198) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 1070 FINAL PASSAGE (#874) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1070 FINAL PASSAGE (#1198) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 1070 FINAL PASSAGE (#874) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Effective date: 06/16/2022. |
2022-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 526. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-06-05 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-06-05 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022. |
2022-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-16 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2022. |
2022-05-10 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-10 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2022. |
2022-05-03 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-02 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 759 reported by the Committee on Judiciary (9-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB759 (Replaces) 2022-05-02 - Becomes HB 1070.