LA HB107 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises procedures relative to a student's inability to pay for school meals and a student's meal debt

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises procedures relative to a student's inability to pay for school meals and a student's meal debt

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-02-24HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020.
2020-02-19HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-02-19HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback