LA HB1063 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB665
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Louisiana Equal Housing Opportunity Act
Title
Provides relative to the Louisiana Equal Housing Opportunity Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 1063 FINAL PASSAGE (#710) (Y: 56 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-09 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 56, nays 40. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-09 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2022. |
2022-05-04 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2022. |
2022-04-27 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-26 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 665 reported by the Committee on Commerce (13-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB665 (Replaces) 2022-04-26 - Becomes HB 1063.