LA HB105 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the ordinary operating expenses of state government for Fiscal Year 2020-2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the ordinary operating expenses of state government for Fiscal Year 2020-2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-26 - House - House Vote on HB 105 FINAL PASSAGE (#424) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-26SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2020-05-26HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-26HouseRead by title. Considered in Committee of the Whole, reported with amendments, amendments adopted.
2020-05-21HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/26/20.
2020-05-21HouseMade Special Order of the day No. 2 for 05/26/20.
2020-05-21HouseReported with amendments (24-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2020-02-26HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2020-02-26HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB105&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1160139
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175045
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175907
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175972
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174775
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174896
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175004
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174906
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174901
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174662
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175979
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175977
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175963
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175779
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175778
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175775
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175527
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175524
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175369
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1160149
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175208
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176112
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176003

Bill Comments

feedback