LA HB105 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the crime of improper supervision of a minor with respect to off-road vehicles and golf carts (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the crime of improper supervision of a minor with respect to off-road vehicles and golf carts (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/17. |
2017-04-20 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported favorably (8-6-1). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2017-03-23 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2017-03-23 | House | Prefiled. |