LA HB1048 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Louisiana State Uniform Construction Code Council to adopt certain codes relative to plumbing
Title
Requires the Louisiana State Uniform Construction Code Council to adopt certain codes relative to plumbing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1048 ADOPT (#1709) (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 1048 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1597) (Y: 69 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 1048 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1120) (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1048 FINAL PASSAGE (#1002) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1048 AMENDMENT # 4276 BY APPEL HB 1048 BY PONTI (#1001) (Y: 18 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - House - House Vote on HB 1048 FINAL PASSAGE (#352) (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 1048 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1597) (Y: 69 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 1048 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1120) (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1048 FINAL PASSAGE (#1002) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1048 AMENDMENT # 4276 BY APPEL HB 1048 BY PONTI (#1001) (Y: 18 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - House - House Vote on HB 1048 FINAL PASSAGE (#352) (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2014-06-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 836. |
2014-06-04 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2014. |
2014-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-06-02 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 5 nays. |
2014-06-01 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2014-06-01 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 69, nays 22. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2014-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. |
2014-06-01 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2014-06-01 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2014-05-27 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Appel, Gallot, and Chabert. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2014-05-22 | House | House conferees appointed: Ponti, Broadwater, and Howard. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2014-05-21 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 80, nays 12, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2014-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/2014. |
2014-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-04-09 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 69, nays 25. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/09/2014. |
2014-04-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-04-01 | House | Reported favorably (18-0). |
2014-03-25 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2014-03-24 | House | Read by title. |