LA HB104 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals certain penalties for failure to maintain compulsory motor vehicle liability insurance (OR SEE FISC NOTE SG EX)
Title
Repeals certain penalties for failure to maintain compulsory motor vehicle liability insurance (OR SEE FISC NOTE SG EX)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2020-02-24 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020. |
2020-02-19 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2020-02-19 | House | Prefiled. |