LA HB1033 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-02 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-02 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the commercial menhaden catch (RE +$198,456 SD EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the commercial menhaden catch (RE +$198,456 SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 1033 FINAL PASSAGE (#513) (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-27 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 22. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-27 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-04-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2022. |
2022-04-26 | House | Notice given. |
2022-04-26 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2022. |
2022-04-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-13 | House | Reported favorably (9-3). |
2022-04-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |