LA HB1029 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-02 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-02 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to Shreveport Water Works Museum (EG +$391,232 GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to Shreveport Water Works Museum (EG +$391,232 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-04-28 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2022-04-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |