LA HB1023 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Becomes HB 1064.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Becomes HB 1064.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the deposit and disbursement of insurance proceeds
Title
Provides relative to the deposit and disbursement of insurance proceeds
Sponsors
Rep. Les Farnum [R] | Rep. Ryan Bourriaque [R] | Rep. Wilford Carter [D] | Rep. Paula Davis [R] |
Rep. Brett Geymann [R] | Rep. Troy Romero [R] | Rep. Phillip Tarver [R] | Sen. Jeremy Stine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | House | Becomes HB 1064. |
2022-04-26 | House | Reported by substitute (13-0). |
2022-04-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |