LA HB1022 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 14, nays 81. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 14, nays 81. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a cause of action for mandating, recommending, or administering certain products
Title
Provides for a cause of action for mandating, recommending, or administering certain products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 1022 FINAL PASSAGE (#1288) (Y: 14 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 14, nays 81. Failed to pass. |
2022-05-31 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2022. |
2022-05-26 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-26 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2022. |
2022-05-25 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported favorably (9-2-1). |
2022-04-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |