LA HB102 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the civil service status of employees of the Housing Authority of the City of Shreveport

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the civil service status of employees of the Housing Authority of the City of Shreveport

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 102 FINAL PASSAGE (#470) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 102 FINAL PASSAGE (#371) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11HouseEffective date: 08/01/2020.
2020-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 170.
2020-06-01HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-05-31SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-29HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2020-05-28SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-27SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2020-05-22HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
2020-05-18HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-15HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2020-02-24HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020.
2020-02-18HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2020-02-18HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback