LA HB1013 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Effective date: August 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Effective date: August 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to boards and commissions
Title
Provides relative to boards and commissions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 1013 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1544) (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1013 FINAL PASSAGE (#1462) (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - House Vote on HB 1013 FINAL PASSAGE (#406) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1013 FINAL PASSAGE (#1462) (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - House Vote on HB 1013 FINAL PASSAGE (#406) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2014. |
2014-06-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 832. |
2014-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2014. |
2014-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 85, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2014-05-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2014. |
2014-05-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2014. |
2014-05-28 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-04-14 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-04-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/14/2014. |
2014-04-08 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-04-07 | House | Reported with amendments (7-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |