LA HB1002 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Effective date: May 26, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Effective date: May 26, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to municipalities governed by special legislative charters
Title
Provides relative to municipalities governed by special legislative charters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1002, FINAL PASSAGE (#646) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1002, FINAL PASSAGE (#251) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1002, FINAL PASSAGE (#251) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Effective date: May 26, 2010. | |
2010-05-26 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 52. | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-05-18 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-05-17 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-05-17 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-12 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-11 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-10 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-20 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | |
2010-04-20 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 20, 2010. | |
2010-04-12 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2010-04-08 | Reported favorably (15-0) (Local and Consent). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-19 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2010-03-19 | Prefiled. |