LA HB100 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 6 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the maximum and minimum size of school boards

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the maximum and minimum size of school boards

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 100 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1040) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 100 ADOPT (#1029) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 100 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#992) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 100 FINAL PASSAGE (#904) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 100 FINAL PASSAGE (#414) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-06SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-06HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-06SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2019-06-06HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2019-06-06HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2019-06-06SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays.
2019-06-06HouseConference Committee report received.
2019-06-06HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2019-06-05SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Chabert, Morrish, and White.
2019-06-05SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2019-06-05HouseHouse conferees appointed: Gisclair, Nancy Landry, and Richard.
2019-06-05SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2019-06-05HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2019-06-04HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/05/19.
2019-06-04HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-06-03SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-06-01SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-31SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-22SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-05-21SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-20HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19.
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-07HouseReported with amendments (11-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-03-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019.
2019-03-21HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-03-21HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB100&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1116779
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132003
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143542
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144893
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131972
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138733
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141700
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141847
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142551
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142977
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1116790
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132289
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140537
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135828
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141927
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143489
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143499

Bill Comments

feedback